WA SB5998 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a graduated real estate excise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a graduated real estate excise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 424, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-30SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-27HouseHeld on second reading.
2019-04-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-27HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-04-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-27HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-27HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 11:30 AM.
2019-04-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2019-04-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-25SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on second reading.
2019-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-18SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-18SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-04-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5998&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5998.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5998-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5998-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5998-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5998-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120461&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5998&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120461&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5998&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback