WA SB5999 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making expenditures from the budget stabilization account for public employer unfunded actuarially accrued liabilities.
Title
Making expenditures from the budget stabilization account for public employer unfunded actuarially accrued liabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5999&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5999.pdf |