WA SB6002 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective date 4/4/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Effective date 4/4/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2014 supplemental operating appropriations.
Title
Making 2014 supplemental operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Senate | Effective date 4/4/2014. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Chapter 221, 2014 Laws PV. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Senators Hill, Braun, Hargrove; Representatives Hunter, Sullivan, Chandler. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 1:20 PM 3/13/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Conference committee report; received 12:47 PM 3/13/2014. |
2014-03-12 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Hunter, Sullivan, Chandler. |
2014-03-12 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Hill, Braun, Hargrove. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2014-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-28 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2014-02-28 | House | First Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-03 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.