WA SB6004 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to fiscal matters.
Title
Relating to fiscal matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 425, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-27 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |