WA SB6032 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Washington apples special license plate.
Title
Creating a Washington apples special license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 93, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |