WA SB6043 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning subscription service legal defense funds.
Title
Concerning subscription service legal defense funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2367 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6043&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6043.pdf |