WA SB6052 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning life insurance products or services that are intended to incent behavioral changes that improve the health and reduce the risk of death of the insured.
Title
Concerning life insurance products or services that are intended to incent behavioral changes that improve the health and reduce the risk of death of the insured.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 197, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-20 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2211 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.