WA SB6056 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of the local infrastructure financing tool for downtown development and redevelopment.
Title
Concerning the use of the local infrastructure financing tool for downtown development and redevelopment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-25 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-25 | EDTI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-18 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1109 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6056&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6056.pdf |