WA SB6068 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for large private airplanes.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for large private airplanes.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 304, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2236 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.