WA SB6073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing menstrual hygiene products in public school bathrooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing menstrual hygiene products in public school bathrooms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19Senate1st substitute bill not substituted.
2020-02-18SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-31SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-12-12SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback