WA SB6074 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting provisions to improve educational outcomes for homeless students.
Title
Enacting provisions to improve educational outcomes for homeless students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 212, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2373 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.