WA SB6074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizing and expanding the financial fraud and identity theft crimes investigation and prosecution program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorizing and expanding the financial fraud and identity theft crimes investigation and prosecution program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-18SenateChapter 60, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-18SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-11SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-06HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-26HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2020-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-14Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-10SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Law & Justice.
2020-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-16SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-16SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-12-12SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2193 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6074&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6074.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6074-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6074-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6074-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120713&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6074&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120713&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6074&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback