WA SB6077 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the use of storm water control facility rate charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the use of storm water control facility rate charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2014-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM.
2014-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment
2014-02-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2014-02-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2014-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2014-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2014-02-07SenateEET - Majority; do pass.
2014-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2014-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2014-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback