WA SB6077 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning high capacity magazines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning high capacity magazines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-23SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2019-12-16SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2240 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback