WA SB6078 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing "Native American Heritage Day."
Title
Recognizing "Native American Heritage Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 177, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |