WA SB6083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning travel trailers.
Title
Concerning travel trailers.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2242 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6083&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6083.pdf |