WA SB6092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Awarding diplomas posthumously.
Title
Awarding diplomas posthumously.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |