WA SB6112 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of alternative traction devices on tires under certain conditions.
Title
Concerning the use of alternative traction devices on tires under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-23 | Chapter 75, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-03-03 | President signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-09 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2012-02-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2012-02-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-08 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-24 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2355 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.