WA SB6112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning evacuation of adult family homes.
Title
Concerning evacuation of adult family homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2344 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.