WA SB6112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning youth solitary confinement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning youth solitary confinement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-28SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2019-12-24SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2277 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback