WA SB6114 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning all-terrain vehicles.
Title
Concerning all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2243 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.