WA SB6115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning off-road vehicle registrations.
Title
Concerning off-road vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-24 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Transportation.