WA SB6123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing state employee leave for organ donation.
Title
Allowing state employee leave for organ donation.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 305, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-21 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2425 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.