WA SB6124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a statewide environmental sustainability education program.
Title
Establishing a statewide environmental sustainability education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2811 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6124&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6124.pdf |