WA SB6132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the learning assistance program to support school-wide behavioral health system of supports and interventions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the learning assistance program to support school-wide behavioral health system of supports and interventions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-31SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2717 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback