WA SB6134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Title
Concerning state reimbursement of election costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |