WA SB6149 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating or reducing the frequency of reports prepared by state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating or reducing the frequency of reports prepared by state agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2009-04-06 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2009-04-03 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB2327 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback