WA SB6149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing reasonable accommodations in the workplace for pregnant women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing reasonable accommodations in the workplace for pregnant women.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-03-10SenateReferred to Senate Rules 3.
2016-03-10SenateOn Concurrence Calendar.
2016-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2016-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-03-04HouseFloor amendment
2016-03-04HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2016-03-02HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2016-02-26HouseGGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment
2016-02-26HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
2016-02-26HouseReferred to General Government & Information Technology.
2016-02-25HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2016-02-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2016-02-25HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2016-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 9:00 AM.
2016-02-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2016-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards
2016-02-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2016-02-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-02-16SenateFloor amendment
2016-02-16Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2016-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-02-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-02-04SenateCL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
2016-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
2016-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
2015-12-14SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback