WA SB6149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the minimum monthly salary paid to Washington state patrol troopers and sergeants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the minimum monthly salary paid to Washington state patrol troopers and sergeants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback