WA SB6153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning driver's license suspensions and revocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning driver's license suspensions and revocations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Law & Justice.
2020-01-14SenateAnd refer to Law & Justice.
2020-01-14SenateTRAN - Majority; without recommendation.
2020-01-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback