WA SB6162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning victims of nonfatal strangulation.
Title
Concerning victims of nonfatal strangulation.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |