WA SB6169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Training on the prevention of harassment, discrimination, and retaliation.
Title
Training on the prevention of harassment, discrimination, and retaliation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |