WA SB6182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning closed captioning on televisions in places of public accommodation.
Title
Concerning closed captioning on televisions in places of public accommodation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |