WA SB6188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the consumption of alcohol for certain special events held on agricultural fairgrounds.
Title
Concerning the consumption of alcohol for certain special events held on agricultural fairgrounds.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6188&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6188.pdf |