WA SB6202 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resentencing persistent offenders with robbery 2 convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resentencing persistent offenders with robbery 2 convictions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-01-09SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback