WA SB6206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a certificate of compliance for marijuana business premises that meet the statutory qualifications at the time of application.
Title
Creating a certificate of compliance for marijuana business premises that meet the statutory qualifications at the time of application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 154, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2359 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.