WA SB6222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.
Title
Concerning commercial property assessed clean energy and resilience.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6222&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6222.pdf |