WA SB6224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collective bargaining for administrative law judges.
Title
Concerning collective bargaining for administrative law judges.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |