WA SB6253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a comprehensive statewide early care and education system by improving accessibility and affordability of early care and education programs for families.
Title
Creating a comprehensive statewide early care and education system by improving accessibility and affordability of early care and education programs for families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |