WA SB6258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the suicide and addiction crisis among American Indians and Alaska Natives.
Title
Addressing the suicide and addiction crisis among American Indians and Alaska Natives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2754 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6258&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6258.pdf |