WA SB6265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the lease or rental of surplus property of school districts.
Title
Concerning the lease or rental of surplus property of school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2617 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.