WA SB6266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning seizure and forfeiture reporting.
Title
Concerning seizure and forfeiture reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |