WA SB6267 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the long-term services and supports trust program by clarifying the ability for individuals with existing long-term care insurance to opt-out of the premium assessment and making technical corrections.
Title
Modifying the long-term services and supports trust program by clarifying the ability for individuals with existing long-term care insurance to opt-out of the premium assessment and making technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 98, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2423 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.