WA SB6268 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing abusive litigation between intimate partners.
Title
Preventing abusive litigation between intimate partners.
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 311, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Law & Justice. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |