WA SB6274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting patient safety in psychiatric hospitals and other health care facilities.
Title
Protecting patient safety in psychiatric hospitals and other health care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2426 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.