WA SB6275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing patient access rights to timely and appropriate postacute care.
Title
Increasing patient access rights to timely and appropriate postacute care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass without amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.