WA SB6280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of facial recognition services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of facial recognition services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31SenateEffective date 7/1/2021.
2020-03-31SenateChapter 257, 2020 Laws PV.
2020-03-31SenateGovernor partially vetoed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-12SenateSecond report of conference committee adopted.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-12HouseConference committee report adopted.
2020-03-12SenateConference committee report; received 5:15 PM 3/12/2020.
2020-03-12HouseConference committee report; received 4:47 PM 3/12/2020.
2020-03-12HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Boehnke, Entenman, Hudgins.
2020-03-12HouseConference committee request granted.
2020-03-12SenateConference committee reappointed. Senators Brown, Nguyen, Wellman.
2020-03-12SenateConference Requested.
2020-03-12SenateConference committee report not adopted.
2020-03-11SenateConference committee report; received 5:15 PM 3/11/2020.
2020-03-11HouseConference committee report; received 5:39 PM 3/11/2020.
2020-03-10SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Nguyen, Brown, Wellman.
2020-03-10SenateConference committee request granted.
2020-03-10HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Boehnke, Entenman, Hudgins.
2020-03-10HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate for a conference.
2020-03-07SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseFloor amendment
2020-03-06HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2020-02-19SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-19Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-23SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6280&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6280.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6280-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6280-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6280-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6280-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121164&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6280&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121164&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6280&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121164&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6280&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121164&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6280&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback