WA SB6281 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Conference committee appointed. Senators Carlyle, Dhingra, Rivers.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the management and oversight of personal data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the management and oversight of personal data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Carlyle, Dhingra, Rivers.
2020-03-10SenateConference committee request granted.
2020-03-10HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Hudgins, Hansen, Dufault.
2020-03-10HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate for a conference.
2020-03-09SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2020-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseITED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.
2020-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-14Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-06SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-23SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-23SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB2742 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback