WA SB6287 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing completion rate requirements for apprenticeship training programs in certain construction trades as part of apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Title
Establishing completion rate requirements for apprenticeship training programs in certain construction trades as part of apprenticeship utilization requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-16 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6287&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6287.pdf |