WA SB6287 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of hydraulic project in relation to the hydraulic project approval permits.
Title
Concerning the definition of hydraulic project in relation to the hydraulic project approval permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6287&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6287.pdf |